judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-94-00057-CR
10-94-00057-CR
04/06/1994
Forgery
Mark Louis Fachorn
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/31/1994Case stored
10/31/1994Mandate issued by this Court
09/14/1994Motion to Appoint AttorneyDismissed as moot
09/14/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
05/04/1994No Description Available.
04/20/1994(NO ACK) Appeal abated
04/07/1994Motion to Appoint Attorney
04/06/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994Notice of Appeal filed
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/2019Case StoredDestroy case in 25 years.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fachorn, Mark LouisAppellantMark Louis Fachorn
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Paschall
Trial Court Information
82nd District Court
Robertson
Honorable Robert M. Stem
92-07-15121-CR