judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: KIRK JACOBS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-08-0255)
Case Number:S-08-0255Case Docketed On:12/04/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: KIRK JACOBS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: KIRK JACOBS, Appellant (Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKirk JacobsWilliam G. Hibbler
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 118
Citation:216 P.3d 1128

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/04/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/04/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/21/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/09/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee/respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/12/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/30/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/02/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/02/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
09/25/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/05/2009Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
10/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Combined Application and Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs, Verification Supporting Same and Notice of ObjectionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/27/2009Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
10/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/27/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/27/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/02/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/28/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal