judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAMONE D. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1434
Short Caption:DAMONE D. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-3721-08Filed Date:11/17/2010

Opening Event Date:11/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:05/10/2012
Argued/Submitted:11/27/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/05/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDamone D. Williams YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Patricia A. HeffernanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
02/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (420 pgs/D. Janifer - 6/28 thru 6/30/10 proc.)
02/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (pgs 421 thru 600/D. Janifer - 7/1/10 proc.)
02/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (273 pgs/Ronan - 7/6 thru 7/9/10 proc.)
02/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (26 pgs/Pirfo - 11/5/10 proc.)(w/CD)
02/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/17/2011RECORD COPIES
02/17/2011RECORD INDEX
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (SEALED documents)
02/22/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
04/12/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 5, 2011. (Castillo)
07/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
07/12/2011FiledOn consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before October 3, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JJ)
10/03/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file brief and limited appendix to 1/3/12.
12/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/04/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motionf or extension to file brief and limited appendix to 2/13/12.
02/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/16/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to the extent that the brief and limited appendix due by 2/21/12.
02/21/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/21/2012FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant)
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (18 pgs/Burr) 4/21/09 proc.
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (109 pgs/Davis) 8/6/09 proc.
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (228 pgs/Richer) 8/11/09 proc.
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (12 pgs/Richer) 8/12/09 proc.
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (24 pgs/Richer) 8/13/09 proc.
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (24 pgs/Richer) 8/13/09 proc.
02/22/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (151 pgs/Janifer) 6/28/10 proc. w/cd
03/19/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File until May 11, 2012 Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/22/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File until May 11, 2012 Brief (Appellee)
05/10/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
05/10/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/25/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/10/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
09/21/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/13/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/20/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
11/20/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/27/2012FiledArgued Before Judge Fisher,Blackburne-Rigsby,Steadman, Mikel Meredith Weidman Esq.,for appellant, Patrica A. Heffernan Esq.,for appellee.
12/18/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
12/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc Other (Appellant)Granted
12/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 2/1/13.
01/15/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
02/05/2013FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall isuue the mandate forthwith.
02/05/2013FiledMandate