judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00086-CR
07-94-00086-CR
04/06/1994
Other Drug Possession
Allen, Kim Stefferone
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/23/1995Mandate Issued
03/03/1995Case Returned from Higher Court
10/27/1994Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/20/1994Do not use
10/20/1994Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
09/12/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/12/1994Submitted
09/12/1994Submission
08/12/1994Brief Filed
08/12/1994Case ready to be set
07/19/1994Brief Filed
06/22/1994Do not use
05/12/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
05/11/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
05/09/1994Do not use
04/06/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/23/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMichael West
Allen, Kim StefferoneCriminal - AppellantBilly D. Price
Trial Court Information
137th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Cecil G. Puryear
93-416,521
40 yrs, TDC