judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00328-CV
01-94-00328-CV
04/06/1994
Miscellaneous/other civil
Carr, Gary L.
General Electric Mortgage Insurance Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/1994Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/12/1994Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/15/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
09/15/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
08/31/1994Motion to dismiss appeal
08/11/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/02/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/01/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/07/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/24/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/31/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
05/19/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/04/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/18/1994Filing Fee in the amount of $50 paid-trans filed
04/06/1994Transcript filed
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/30/1994Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeBruce M. Badger
StateAppelleeRuth W. Garner
StateAppellantThomas E. Ross
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 2
Harris
Honorable TOM SULLIVAN
586,514