judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0367-94
PD-0367-94
04/07/1994
PDR Case Type
CROOK, TYRONE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/10/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
04/07/1994PDR FILED
04/07/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CROOK, TYRONEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Samuel W. Hudson, III
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-92-00397-CR
AFF 11-10-93
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
194th District Court
Dallas
Honorable CHARLES SHERRILL
F91-66764-M