judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-94-00136-CR
09-94-00136-CR
04/06/1994
appeal from granting of motion to suppress
The State of Texas
Fisher, Jack
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/25/1994Mandate Issued
07/25/1994MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
06/09/1994Order EnteredDismissed
05/31/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
05/27/1994Letter
04/06/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/25/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
O'Ffiel, KarlaCourt reporterKarla O'Fiel
Fisher, JackAppelleeDanny Doyle
The State Of TexasAppellantTom Maness
Ramos, LolitaDistrict or County ClerksLolita Ramos
Plessala, HaroldDistrict or County JudgeHonorable Harold Plessala
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Jefferson
Honorable Harold Plessala
170630