judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00217-CV
04-94-00217-CV
04/06/1994
Juvenile
In the Matter of R.L.L.F., A Child
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/21/1995Mandate Issued
02/21/1995Mandate Issued
12/23/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedFiling is Moot
12/23/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedFiling is Moot
12/21/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
12/21/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
11/29/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
11/28/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/02/1994Brief Filed
11/02/1994Requests Oral Argument
10/25/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/18/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/19/1994Order Entered
09/19/1994Order Entered
09/19/1994Order Entered
09/19/1994Order Entered
06/16/1994Response to Motion Filed
05/20/1994No Description Available.
05/20/1994No Description Available.
05/20/1994No Description Available.
05/18/1994Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/1994Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/1994Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/1994Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/12/1994Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
05/12/1994Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
05/11/1994Appeal Bond Filed
05/11/1994Appeal Bond Filed
05/04/1994Show cause hearing held
05/04/1994Show cause hearing held
05/04/1994Show cause hearing held
05/04/1994Show cause hearing held
04/06/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/17/1994Judgment Signed in Trial Court
03/17/1994Judgment Signed in Trial Court
03/14/1994No Description Available.
03/14/1994No Description Available.
03/14/1994No Description Available.
03/14/1994No Description Available.
03/14/1994No Description Available.
03/14/1994No Description Available.
03/14/1994No Description Available.
03/14/1994No Description Available.
03/14/1994No Description Available.
03/14/1994No Description Available.
03/14/1994No Description Available.
12/09/1993Motion for New Trial Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/21/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
In The Matter Of R.l.l.f., A CAppellantR. Norvell Graham, Jr. Jr.
Texas, The State OfAppelleeEdward F. Shaughnessy, III
Margaret M. Fent
Trial Court Information
73rd Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Paul Andrew Mireles
93-JUV-1003
N/A