judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00196-CV
04-94-00196-CV
04/06/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Teresa Burrhus, Individually And As Parent of And Next Friend of Christiana Burrhus And Personal Representative of The Estate of Terralle A. Burrhus
M & S Supply Company, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/1997Original Exhibits Returned
06/11/1997Mandate Issued
06/11/1997Mandate Issued
06/06/1997Case Returned from Higher Court
04/10/1997Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
12/05/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/05/1996Information regarding cause received
11/20/1996Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/15/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/15/1996Writ of Error filed
10/23/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/02/1996Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/18/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/18/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/15/1996Submitted
02/15/1996Submission
02/15/1996Submitted
01/09/1996Submission
12/12/1995Motion to Postpone Oral Argument DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/1995Motion to Postpone Oral Argument Filed
12/06/1995Reply brief filed
11/01/1995Submission
07/13/1995Case ready to be set
07/13/1995Requests Oral Argument
07/13/1995Brief Filed
07/13/1995Case ready to be set
06/12/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/07/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/19/1995Brief Filed
05/19/1995Requests Oral Argument
04/20/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/22/1995Order Entered
03/22/1995Order Entered
03/22/1995Order Entered
03/16/1995Motion to Increase Bond DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/15/1995No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/15/1995Appeal Reinstated
03/15/1995Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
03/15/1995Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/1995Appeal Reinstated
03/10/1995Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/10/1995Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/10/1995Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/09/1995Response to Motion Filed
03/08/1995Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/24/1995Response to Motion Filed
01/24/1995Response to Motion Filed
01/18/1995Response to Motion Filed
01/18/1995Motion to Increase Bond Filed
12/22/1994No Description Available.
12/22/1994Exhibits Filed
12/22/1994No Description Available.
12/22/1994Exhibits received
12/22/1994No Description Available.
12/22/1994No Description Available.
12/20/1994No Description Available.
12/05/1994Amended Motion Filed
12/05/1994Amended Motion Filed
12/02/1994No Description Available.
12/02/1994No Description Available.
12/02/1994No Description Available.
12/02/1994No Description Available.
12/02/1994No Description Available.
12/02/1994No Description Available.
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
11/21/1994Order Entered
10/17/1994Motion Filed
06/20/1994Order EnteredAbated
06/20/1994Order EnteredAbated
06/20/1994Order EnteredAbated
06/20/1994Order EnteredAbated
06/20/1994Order EnteredAbated
06/20/1994Order EnteredAbated
05/25/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
05/25/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
05/16/1994Information regarding cause received
05/16/1994Information regarding cause received
05/02/1994Amended Motion Filed
05/02/1994Amended Motion Filed
04/28/1994No Description Available.
04/28/1994No Description Available.
04/28/1994No Description Available.
04/20/1994Motion Filed
04/20/1994Motion Filed
04/19/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/19/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/11/1994No Description Available.
04/11/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/14/1994Appeal Bond Filed
03/14/1994Appeal Bond Filed
03/14/1994Appeal Bond Filed
03/14/1994Appeal Bond Filed
01/13/1994Motion for New Trial Filed
01/13/1994Motion for New Trial Filed
01/13/1994Motion for New Trial Filed
12/14/1993Judgment Signed in Trial Court
12/14/1993Judgment Signed in Trial Court
12/14/1993Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/11/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Teresa Burrhus, Ind. Et Al.AppellantGerald T. Drought
Vincent A. Notzon
The Texas Property & CasualtyAppelleeKelley G. Loud
Jan Ferguson
M & S Supply Company, Inc.AppelleeMyra K. Morris
Will W. Pierson
Frank E. Perez
Trial Court Information
229th Judicial District Court
Jim Hogg
Honorable Ricardo H. Garcia
3671
N/A