judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-94-00071-CV
06-94-00071-CV
04/06/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Maryland Casualty Company, Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Head Industrial Coatings and Services, Inc., Appellee/Cross-Appellant
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/05/2003Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/09/1997Mandate Issued
04/09/1997Mandate Issued
04/09/1997Mandate Issued
02/28/1997Motion for Rehearing Disposed
10/18/1996Opinion issued
10/18/1996Writ Disposed
10/18/1996Writ Disposed
10/27/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/26/1995Writ Filed
10/18/1995Writ Filed
10/16/1995Writ Filed
10/09/1995Motion-ext. time file app.writ of error disposed
10/05/1995Motion - ext. file application for writ of error
08/31/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/31/1995Substituted OpinionReversed & Remanded to Tr. Ct.
08/31/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/31/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/10/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/07/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/07/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/22/1995Substituted OpinionReversed & Remanded to Tr. Ct.
06/22/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/22/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/22/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/1995Motion for Rehearing Granted
05/24/1995Response to Motion
05/18/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/15/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/09/1995Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/1995Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/08/1995Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
05/05/1995Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
05/05/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/20/1995Opinion issuedMODIFIED;AND AS MODIFIED; REVERSED AND REMANDED
04/20/1995Opinion issuedMODIFIED;AND AS MODIFIED; REVERSED AND REMANDED
03/31/1995LETTER
03/28/1995LETTER
12/01/1994Submitted
12/01/1994Response to Motion
12/01/1994Submission
11/29/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/28/1994Response to Motion
11/21/1994Reply Brief Filed
11/21/1994Holding for Record
11/21/1994MOTION FILED
10/18/1994Submission
09/20/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/16/1994Case ready to be set
09/16/1994Brief Filed
09/16/1994Request for Oral Argument
09/12/1994MOTION FILED
08/22/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/15/1994Brief Filed
08/15/1994Request for Oral Argument
08/12/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/22/1994Brief Filed
07/22/1994Request for Oral Argument
06/28/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/23/1994No Description Available.
06/23/1994Response to Motion
06/21/1994Motion to supplement record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/17/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/17/1994Motion for leave to file
05/09/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/28/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/06/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/06/1994Transcript Filed
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/11/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Head Industrial CoatingsAppelleeWinford L. Dunn Jr.
Maryland Casualty CompanyAppellantHon. R. Brent Cooper
Hon. Portia J. Bott
Gans & Smith Insurance AgencyAppelleeHon. Scott Patrick Stolley
Trial Court Information
4th District Court
Rusk
Honorable Donald R. Ross
91-340