judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00205-CR
04-94-00205-CR
04/06/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Cerna, Reynaldo
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/23/2016Internal memo
02/22/1995Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
02/08/1995Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
02/03/1995Mandate Issued
02/03/1995Mandate Issued
12/14/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/14/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/04/1994Submitted
10/04/1994Submission
10/04/1994Submitted
09/06/1994Submission
06/27/1994Brief Filed
06/27/1994Case ready to be set
06/27/1994Case ready to be set
06/02/1994Brief Filed
05/10/1994Motion to Consolidate Cases DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/04/1994No Description Available.
05/04/1994Motion to Consolidated Cases Filed
05/03/1994No Description Available.
05/03/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/04/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
03/22/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/03/2020RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
05/22/2018Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasHonorable Thomas F. Lee
Cerna, ReynaldoCriminal - AppellantRuben Nino
Trial Court Information
63rd Judicial District Court
Val Verde
Honorable George Thurmond
7313
Ten years confinement TDCJ