judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00176-CV
03-94-00176-CV
04/06/1994
Negligence tort, other
Nathan Robinson, Individually and as Next Friend of Nathan L. Robinson, Angela Robinson, and Robin Marie Robinson, Minor Children; and Mary Robinson
Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, Johnson Roofing, Inc. and Spectrum Associates, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/30/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/22/1996CASE STORED
10/22/1996CASE STORED
12/23/1994Mandate Issued
10/05/1994Opinion issuedDismissed for Want of Prosecution
09/12/1994Appellant's brief overdue notice in criminal case
08/11/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/11/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
08/08/1994Response to Motion
07/29/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/14/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
06/20/1994Appellant's brief overdue notice in criminal case
05/31/1994Statement of Facts Received
05/25/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispOverruled
05/25/1994Order EnteredOverruled
04/29/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/06/1994Transcript Filed
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/23/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Southwestern Bell Telephone CoAppelleeMr. Jeff D. Otto
Robinson, Individually And AsAppellantMs. Sandra K. Houston
Robinson, MaryAppellantMs. Sandra K. Houston
Houston General Insurance CompInterested partyMs. Sandra K. Houston
Johnson Roofing, Inc.AppelleeMr. Jeff D. Otto
Spectrum Associates, Inc.AppelleeMr. Ronald D. Wamsted
Trial Court Information
169th District Court
Bell
Honorable Stanton B Pemberton
141,251-C