judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00337-CR
01-94-00337-CR
04/06/1994
Felony DWI
Swanson, Keith Thomas
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/30/1995Mandate issued
06/03/1995No petition for review or writ of error was filed
05/19/1995Motion for rehearing was not filed
05/04/1995Opinion issuedDismissed
05/04/1995Opinion issuedDismissed
03/29/1995Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
12/19/1994Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
10/14/1994Brief due for retained counsel
07/28/1994Transcript filed
04/25/1994Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21)
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/31/1994Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
03/31/1994Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/30/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantW. B. 'Bennie' House
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 8
Harris
Honorable D. NEEL RICHARDSON
9348609
500 fine & 180 days