judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00323-CV
01-94-00323-CV
04/06/1994
Original proceeding for writ of mandamus (Gov't 22.221(a), (b))
Daisy Mae Mitchell
Hon. Ray L. Breeding, Constable, Precinct Two, Fort Bend
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/10/1994Motion for rehearing was not filed
05/26/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
05/26/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
04/18/1994Original proceedings: Reply Brief filed
04/07/1994Order enteredGrant motion
04/06/1994Motion for leave to file writ of mandamus
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/10/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateRespondentEric Lipper
StateRelatorCarnegie H. Mims Jr.
Trial Court Information