judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00331-CR
14-94-00331-CR
04/06/1994
Capital Murder
Bell, Marcus Dwayne
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/18/1996Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
10/18/1996Mandate Issued
11/02/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/02/1995Case ready to be set
11/02/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/25/1995Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
10/25/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/23/1995State's brief DUE
09/28/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/22/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/24/1995Motion to reconsider DISPOSED - ANT, APE, APP, STADENIED
08/16/1995Motion to reconsider FILED - ANT, APE, APP, STA
08/14/1995State's brief DUE
08/10/1995Mtn.Lv. file supp.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPDENIED
08/08/1995Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
08/04/1995Mtn.Lv. file supp.brief FILED - ANT,APE,APP
08/04/1995Supplement brief RECEIVED-ANT,APE
07/17/1995Appellant's brief DUE
07/17/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/01/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/30/1995Appellant's brief DUE
05/26/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/13/1995Appellant's brief DUE
04/06/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/31/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/20/1995Hearing Record FILED
03/16/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/10/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/08/1995Past due brief
02/27/1995Appellant's brief DUE
01/26/1995Case reinstated
01/26/1995Ext.time file Supp.State.FactsDISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
01/26/1995Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
01/26/1995Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
01/26/1995No description available.
01/26/1995No description available.
01/26/1995Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
01/26/1995Transcript FILED
01/13/1995Supplemental transcript DUE
01/10/1995Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
11/17/1994Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
10/11/1994Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
05/31/1994Supplemental transcript DUE
05/19/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
05/19/1994Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
05/12/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
05/12/1994Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
05/12/1994Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
05/09/1994Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
04/28/1994Opinion issuedDISMISSED
04/28/1994Opinion issuedDISMISSED
04/27/1994Submitted
04/27/1994Submission
04/27/1994Submitted
04/27/1994Case ready to be set
04/22/1994Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
04/19/1994Transcript received only; mtn. pending
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/28/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
08/18/1993Motion for new trial FILED
08/13/1993Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/18/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasKeli Pool Roper
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantCharles Freeman
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantWalter J. Pink
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable JOE KEGANS
622210
Life TDC