judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00116-CR
07-94-00116-CR
04/08/1994
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Hart, Dan
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/22/1996Mandate Issued
04/03/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/30/1995Submitted
11/30/1995Submission
10/18/1995Submission
06/05/1995Brief Filed
06/05/1995Case ready to be set
05/22/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
05/02/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
05/01/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/24/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/03/1995Brief Filed
02/14/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.DENIED
02/10/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/27/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
01/26/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/23/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
11/22/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/25/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
09/23/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
08/24/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
08/24/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/21/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
07/20/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/28/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
06/23/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/02/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
05/27/1994Do not use
05/27/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/19/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
04/15/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/30/1994Do not use
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Hart, DanCriminal - AppellantFred M. Talkington
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F93-40817-J
10 yrs, TDC