judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00115-CR
07-94-00115-CR
04/08/1994
Other Drug Possession
Clifton, Johnny Edward
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/08/1997Mandate Issued
12/20/1996Case Returned from Higher Court
12/13/1996Mandate Issued
06/04/1996Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/16/1996Case Returned from Higher Court
02/16/1996Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/15/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/08/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
12/15/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/30/1995Submitted
11/30/1995Submission
11/16/1995Supplemental Brief Filed
11/07/1995Motion for Supplemental Brief DisposedGRANT
10/25/1995Supplemental Brief Filed
10/25/1995Motion For Supplemental Brief Filed
10/18/1995Submission
02/16/1995Brief Filed
02/16/1995Case ready to be set
01/18/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
12/23/1994Brief Filed
12/15/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
10/12/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
09/19/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
09/13/1994Do not use
09/13/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/12/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
07/11/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/28/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/11/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Clifton, Johnny EdwardCriminal - AppellantJeffrey B. Keck
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Dallas
Honorable Donald H. Lane
F93-66945-TH
75 yrs, TDC