judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00136-CR
07-94-00136-CR
04/08/1994
All Misdemeanors
Smith, Kelly Don
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/01/1995Mandate Issued
10/12/1995Case Returned from Higher Court
05/26/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/17/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
04/14/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/03/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/16/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/03/1995Submitted
03/03/1995Submission
02/03/1995Submission
10/05/1994Brief Filed
10/05/1994Case ready to be set
09/09/1994Brief Filed
08/11/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
07/11/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
07/08/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/13/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
05/13/1994Do not use
05/05/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/14/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasAppelleeJohn C. Vance
Smith, Kelly DonAppellantGeorge Milner III
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No 3
Dallas
Honorable Michael Schwille
MA92-66522-C
$750 fine 120 da/12 mo prb