judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORIO HERNANDEZ V. BLANCA BENITEZ

Case Information: 10-FM-1430
Short Caption:GREGORIO HERNANDEZ V. BLANCA BENITEZClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO3449-10Filed Date:11/12/2010

Opening Event Date:11/12/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/05/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/06/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/06/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregorio Hernandez Y
David E. George YN
AppelleeBlanca Benitez Y
Jeanine GomezYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/12/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/08/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 12, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a copy of the online statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
01/07/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 10/14/10 (rt. needed)
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (71 pgs/tape) 10/14/10 proc. w/cd
01/12/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
01/24/2011RECORD INDEX
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 7 days
03/11/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/11/2011RECEIVED- copy of order from superior court granting aple's cost waive
03/28/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief and appendix
04/06/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief and limited appendix. It is (MORE)
04/06/2011ORDER DENY APLE MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL It is (MORE)
04/06/2011 F/O that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW)
04/06/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/06/2011APPENDIX
05/05/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/05/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/13/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/06/2011FiledSubmitted To Glickman,Oberly,Pryor
12/15/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges and Pryor, Senior Judge)
01/06/2012FiledMandate