judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ISHAM (MICHAEL) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 38248
Short Caption:ISHAM (MICHAEL) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0100003HClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/10/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/30/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/30/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12822
08/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-13777
12/10/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-20713
12/10/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/11/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn17[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted. On November 1, 2001, appellant filed a request with this court for permission to submit an appellate brief. The State opposed the request. We decline to extend permission to appellant to file an appellate brief. Therefore, the State's motion opposing the request is moot.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-10149
07/09/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-10599
07/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/16/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 10, 2002. 02-10599