judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRYON THROCKMARTIN and VANESSA THROCKMARTIN v. CENTURY 21 TOP REALTY, a Wyoming corporation; and KATHIE HOVE

Case Heading (S-08-0250)
Case Number:S-08-0250Case Docketed On:11/20/2008
Linked To: S-08-0269
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:BRYON THROCKMARTIN and VANESSA THROCKMARTIN v. CENTURY 21 TOP REALTY, a Wyoming corporation; and KATHIE HOVE
Full Title:BRYON THROCKMARTIN and VANESSA THROCKMARTIN, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. CENTURY 21 TOP REALTY, a Wyoming corporation; and KATHIE HOVE, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBryon ThrockmartinJessica Rutzick
AppellantVanessa ThrockmartinJessica Rutzick
AppelleeCentury 21 Top RealtyBillie LM Addleman
Gary R. Scott
AppelleeKathie HoveBillie LM Addleman
Gary R. Scott

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Professional negligence, Property - Real
Opinion Number:20140 WY 23
Citation:226 P.3d 793

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/20/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/20/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/30/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/31/2008Event - Hardcopy received -Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/31/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
01/08/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee Century 21 Top Realty and Kathie Hove; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/10/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/11/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/16/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/20/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Depositions and Exhibits; Volume V, Amended Index and Additional Original Pleadings.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jessica Rutzick for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Billie LM Addleman for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Jessica Rutzick for appellant; Billie LM Addleman and P. Craig Silva for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/03/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/19/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/19/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/24/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/23/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal