judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-94-00084-CV
08-94-00084-CV
04/08/1994
Contract
Midland Ventures, Ltd.
Whiteye Enterprises, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/09/2016Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/13/1995Mandate Issued
06/13/1995Shuck purged
06/13/1995Mandate Issued
08/03/1994Judgment IssuedDismissed
08/03/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/1994Judgment IssuedDismissed
08/03/1994Submission
08/03/1994Submitted
08/03/1994Case ready to be set
07/20/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
06/15/1994Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/31/1994Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/09/1994Fee paid
05/09/1994Fee paid
05/06/1994Brief Filed
04/11/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/08/1994Payment of fee due requested
04/08/1994Transcript Filed
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/09/2016Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WHITEYE ENTERPRISES, INC.AppelleeHon. Alan G. Moravcik
MIDLAND VENTURES, LTD.AppellantHon. Howard Siegel
Trial Court Information
142nd District Court
Midland
Honorable George D. Gilles
A39,028