judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00153-CR
07-94-00153-CR
04/08/1994
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Norton, Robert
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/02/2006Case returned from Attorney General
01/06/2006Case forwarded to Attorney General
08/07/1995Mandate Issued
06/22/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/22/1995Submitted
06/22/1995Submission
06/19/1995Case reinstated
06/19/1995Do not use
06/19/1995Case reinstated
12/07/1994Mandate Issued
12/07/1994Opinion issuedAbated
12/07/1994Submitted
12/07/1994Submission
07/08/1994Mot. for extension of time to file record filedGRANT
05/19/1994Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
04/29/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/07/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Norton, RobertCriminal - AppellantRuth Kollman
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Trial Court Information
203rd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Thomas Thorpe
F93-03990-SP
50 yrs, TDC