judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00155-CV
07-94-00155-CV
04/08/1994
Contract
William C. Dear & Associates, Inc.
Plastronics, Inc.
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/30/2005Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/31/1996Mandate Issued
05/14/1996Case Returned from Higher Court
02/16/1996Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/12/1996Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc.
01/24/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/11/1996Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/04/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed,Reversed & Remanded to Trial Court
12/14/1995Letter Brief Filed
12/07/1995Letter Brief Filed
12/01/1995Submitted
12/01/1995Submission
10/18/1995Submission
05/12/1994Brief Filed
05/12/1994Case ready to be set
04/15/1994Brief Filed
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/16/1994Do not use
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/31/1996Case StoredCase stored
09/30/2005Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Plastronics, Inc.AppelleeG. Michael Gruber
Plastronics. Inc.AppelleeJulia F. Pendery
William C. Dear & AssociatesAppellantRobert M. Clark
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 4
Dallas
Honorable Robert Day
CC94-970-D