judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00132-CV
07-94-00132-CV
04/08/1994
Contract
Pacer Contracting Corporation
Transamerica Insurance Company
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/29/1996Mandate Issued
12/12/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/30/1995Submitted
11/30/1995Submission
10/18/1995Submission
06/14/1994Brief Filed
06/14/1994Case ready to be set
05/20/1994Brief Filed
04/22/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/14/1994Mediation Information Sheet
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/29/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pacer Contracting CorporationAppellantMichael R. Johnson
Transamerica Insurance CompanyAppelleeKeith A. Langley
Trial Court Information
68th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gary Hall
91-1716-C