judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-94-00140-CR
09-94-00140-CR
04/08/1994
Drug Possession
Brown, Ray Anthony
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/13/1995Mandate Issued
02/13/1995MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
12/28/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/27/1994Submitted
10/27/1994Brief Filed
10/27/1994Case ready to be set
10/27/1994Submission
10/06/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/28/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/01/1994Brief Filed
08/02/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/29/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/30/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/29/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/03/1994Statement of Facts Filed
05/25/1994Transcript Filed
04/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/13/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasClyde M. Herrington
Brown, Ray AnthonyAppellantJohn Henry Tatum
Trial Court Information
159th District Court
Angelina
Honorable David Walker
16930
10 years probated