Case: 07-94-00144-CR
07-94-00144-CR
04/08/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Lilly, Eric James
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/05/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/19/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/03/1995 | Submitted | | |
03/03/1995 | Submission | | |
02/15/1995 | Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous) | GRANT | |
02/13/1995 | Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous) | | |
02/03/1995 | Submission | | |
12/27/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
12/27/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/02/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
11/30/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
11/04/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
09/09/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | GRANT | |
07/26/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | GRANT | |
07/15/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | GRANT | |
07/01/1994 | Do not use | | |
06/27/1994 | Do not use | | |
05/24/1994 | Do not use | | |
05/23/1994 | Do not use | | |
04/08/1994 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
04/08/1994 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
03/11/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/05/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | John C. Vance |
Lilly, Eric James | Criminal - Appellant | Kathi Alyce Drew |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F93-42406-J
50 yrs, TDC