judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00142-CR
07-94-00142-CR
04/08/1994
Other Drug Sale
Garcia, Mario Flores
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/24/1995Mandate Issued
09/08/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/08/1995Submitted
09/08/1995Submission
08/28/1995Brief Filed
08/28/1995Case ready to be set
08/07/1995Case reinstated
08/07/1995Case reinstated
07/31/1995Brief Filed
07/31/1995Do not use
07/03/1995Submitted
07/03/1995Mandate Issued
07/03/1995Opinion issuedAbated
07/03/1995Submission
03/13/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
03/06/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/23/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/22/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/31/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
10/18/1994Letter of Inquiry filed
06/27/1994Do not use
06/17/1994Do not use
06/17/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/11/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Garcia, Mario FloresCriminal - AppellantJose A. Stewart
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Trial Court Information
203rd District Court
Dallas
F94-00144-P
50 yrs, TDC