judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00113-CR
07-94-00113-CR
04/08/1994
Other Drug Possession
Mathis, Sherman Wayne
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/1995Mandate Issued
12/30/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/30/1994Submitted
12/30/1994Submission
12/21/1994Brief Filed
12/21/1994Case ready to be set
11/28/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
11/23/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/24/1994Brief Filed
10/24/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
10/12/1994Letter of Inquiry filed
06/27/1994Do not use
06/17/1994Do not use
06/17/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/11/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mathis, Sherman WayneCriminal - AppellantRuss Henrichs
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F94-00433-WJ
35 yrs, TDC