judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00108-CR
07-94-00108-CR
04/08/1994
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Matthew, Greg Marvin
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/1994Mandate Issued
07/18/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.DENIED
07/18/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
07/18/1994Submitted
07/18/1994Submission
06/13/1994Case ready to be set
06/13/1994Brief Filed
06/13/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
06/10/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/12/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
05/11/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/12/1994Brief Filed
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/17/1994Do not use
03/09/1994Do not use
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/14/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Matthew, Greg MarviniCriminal - AppellantR. D. Rucker
Trial Court Information
363rd District Court
Dallas
F93-31814-TW
16 yrs, TDC