judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00127-CR
07-94-00127-CR
04/08/1994
Robbery
Williams, Aries D.
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/06/1996Mandate Issued
12/21/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/21/1995Submitted
12/21/1995Submission
12/06/1995Case ready to be set
12/06/1995Brief Filed
11/16/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
11/16/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
10/11/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.Granted in part/Overruled in part
09/20/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/05/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
08/30/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/24/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.Motion Mooted
08/24/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedMotion Mooted
08/18/1995Case reinstated
08/18/1995Supplemental Record Filed
08/18/1995Case reinstated
07/11/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/07/1995Mandate Issued
07/07/1995Opinion issuedAbated
07/07/1995Submitted
07/07/1995Submission
03/30/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
12/23/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/22/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/13/1994Letter of Inquiry filed
10/05/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
10/04/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/20/1994Letter of Inquiry filed
07/07/1994Do not use
06/17/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
02/24/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Williams, Aries D.Criminal - AppellantJose A. Stewart
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Larry W. Baraka
F93-66091-RI
25 yrs, TDC, $1000 fine