judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00128-CV
07-94-00128-CV
04/08/1994
Divorce
Hagberg, Sarah G.
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/12/1995Mandate Issued
03/27/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/21/1995Submitted
03/21/1995Submission
03/06/1995Submission
03/03/1995Submission Vacated
02/03/1995Submission
06/16/1994Case ready to be set
06/16/1994Brief Filed
06/14/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
06/01/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/27/1994Brief Filed
05/24/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
05/09/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/15/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/05/1994Do not use
03/17/1994Mot for Ext Transcript DispGRANT
03/17/1994Do not use
03/14/1994Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
03/14/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/12/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hagberg, Delwin E.AppelleeRobert W Minshew
Hagberg, Sarah G.AppellantDonald Johnston
Trial Court Information
336th District Court
Grayson
Honorable Bradley Smith
87-110,889-2