judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00122-CR
07-94-00122-CR
04/08/1994
Other Drug Possession
Sandobal, Julio
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1996Mandate Issued
11/21/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/21/1995Submitted
11/21/1995Submission
11/14/1995Case ready to be set
08/18/1995Supplemental Record Filed
08/18/1995Case reinstated
08/18/1995Case reinstated
07/31/1995Brief Filed
07/03/1995Opinion issuedAbated
07/03/1995Submitted
07/03/1995Submission
06/27/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedOverruled
06/14/1995Letter of Inquiry filed
03/13/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
03/06/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/03/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/22/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/28/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
10/05/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp
09/27/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/02/1994Do not use
06/30/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/11/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Sandobal, JulioCriminal - AppellantJose A. Stewart
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Larry W. Baraka
F93-01260-HI
15 yrs, TDC, $10,000 fine