judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00119-CR
07-94-00119-CR
04/08/1994
Burglary
Martin, Herschel Duane
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/07/1994Mandate Issued
09/21/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/21/1994Submitted
09/21/1994Submission
08/25/1994Brief Filed
08/25/1994Case ready to be set
07/28/1994Brief Filed
07/26/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
07/09/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/09/1994Letter of Inquiry filed
04/18/1994Do not use
04/12/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Martin, Herschel DuaneCriminal - AppellantBruce Anton
Trial Court Information
291st District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gerry Holden Meier
F92-44926-SU
6 yrs, TDC