judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00120-CR
07-94-00120-CR
04/08/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Williams, Margaret Ann
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/03/1996Mandate Issued
11/15/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/15/1995Submitted
11/15/1995Submission
10/24/1995Case ready to be set
08/30/1995Brief Filed
08/30/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
07/11/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
06/28/1995Letter of Inquiry filed
03/30/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
12/22/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
11/28/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
09/30/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
09/27/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/01/1994Do not use
06/28/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/11/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/03/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Williams, Margaret AnnCriminal - AppellantJose A. Stewart
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Larry W. Baraka
F93-65972-NI
15, yrs, TDC $1,000 fine