judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00121-CR
07-94-00121-CR
04/08/1994
Other Drug Sale
Barnes, Steven M
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/09/1996Mandate Issued
03/20/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/08/1996Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/26/1996Mot. for extension of time to file Rehearing DispGRANT
01/26/1996Motion to withdraw appeal disposedOverruled
01/02/1996Motion to withdraw attorney disposed
01/02/1996Mot. for extension of time to file rehearing filed
12/07/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/30/1995Submitted
11/30/1995Submission
10/18/1995Submission
04/11/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
04/10/1995Brief Filed
04/10/1995Case ready to be set
04/10/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/12/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
12/30/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
12/02/1994Brief Filed
11/02/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
10/28/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/15/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
09/14/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/08/1994Do not use
07/11/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
07/08/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/27/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/11/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/09/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Barnes, Steven MCriminal - AppellantCarl E. Gaines
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Larry W. Baraka
F93-59662-KI
25 yrs, TDC $2000 fine