judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00148-CR
07-94-00148-CR
04/08/1994
Other Felony
Bumpers, Mark
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/28/1996Mandate Issued
05/08/1996Case Returned from Higher Court
03/05/1996Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/04/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
01/05/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/05/1996Submitted
01/05/1996Case reinstated
01/05/1996Submission
01/04/1996Case reinstated
12/22/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/01/1995Submitted
12/01/1995Submission
10/18/1995Submission
09/29/1995Brief Filed
09/29/1995Case ready to be set
09/01/1995Brief Filed
04/21/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
04/21/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/27/1995Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
03/27/1995Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
03/20/1995Do not use
02/15/1995Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
02/14/1995Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/15/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
10/14/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
10/14/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/09/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
08/08/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/24/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
06/03/1994Letter of Inquiry filed
04/12/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/28/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bumpers, MarkCriminal - AppellantRobert P. Abbott
Michelle Phillips Scheef
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Dallas
Honorable Janice Lough Warder
F94-00149-JH
12 yrs, TDC