judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00137-CV
07-94-00137-CV
04/08/1994
Contract
Morris, Temple & Co. of Texas, et al
North American Insurance Agency
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/30/1995Mandate Issued
05/15/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/03/1995Submitted
03/03/1995Submission
02/03/1995Submission
05/16/1994Brief Filed
05/16/1994Case ready to be set
04/18/1994Brief Filed
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/15/1994Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/30/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
North American Insurance AgencAppelleeJohn M Gillis
Morris, Temple & Co. Of Texas,AppellantRichard L. Bufkin
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe B. Brown
93-1961-D