judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9074
C-9074
09/20/1989
Second App Writ Error
NORTH BELT 28.019 LTD. and MOHAMMAD LADJEVARDIAN
WILDWOOD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY and DOUGLAS UTILITY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/22/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP N0#2: WILWOOD CONSTRUCTION CO ET AL
09/20/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP N0#1: NORTH BELT 28,019 LTD.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/27/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
11/22/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP.#2 - WILDWOOD CONSTRUCTION
11/22/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP.#1 - NORTH BELT
10/12/1989Case forwarded to Court
10/12/1989No description available.
09/29/1989Letter FiledWILDWOOD'S CROSS APP CONSTITUTES REPLY AS WELL AS APPLICATION. NO SEPARATE REPLY WILL BE FILED.
09/22/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP N0#2: WILWOOD CONSTRUCTION CO ET AL
09/20/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP N0#1: NORTH BELT 28,019 LTD.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/27/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
Rule 90, 06-29-89
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable PAUL C. MURPHY
Trial Court Information
333rd District Court
Harris
Honorable David V. Wilson
84-02278