judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9076
C-9076
09/20/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
JOSE F. OLIVARES IN HIS OWN BEHALF AND IN BEHALF OF PERSONS
THE HONORABLE JOE E. KELLY JUDGE (RETIRED) ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/19/1990Motion for RehearingRelatorincl/1cc/A Staff Report to the Sunset Advisory Commission
07/25/1990Exhibits in case/cause filedRelatorDISCOVERY FROM TRIAL COURT
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/20/1990Case StoredRehearing Overrruled
12/19/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledRehearing Overruled
10/19/1990Motion for Rehearingincl/1cc/A Staff Report to the Sunset Advisory Commission
10/19/1990Motion for Rehearing forwarded
10/18/1990Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedgranted to October 19, 1990.
10/16/1990Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for RehearingMotion forwarded to "M".
10/16/1990Notice requesting filing feeMo Re - $10.00
09/27/1990Notice requesting filing feem/e/t to file mo re - $10.00
09/12/1990Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing granted2ND M/L/F EXHIBIT
09/12/1990Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.OverruledMotion for ancillary relief
09/12/1990Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedM/L/F TO FILE EXHIBIT
09/12/1990Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedMO FOR LEAVE TO SUBSTITUTE EXHIBIT
09/12/1990M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruledMO/ANCILLARY RELIEF OR/MOS. FILE EX GR
07/25/1990Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing granted3RD M/L/F EXHIBITS
07/25/1990Exhibits in case/cause filedDISCOVERY FROM TRIAL COURT
07/24/1990Miscellaneous Motion3RD M/L/F EXHIBIT
07/24/1990Exhibits receivedDISCOVERY FROM TRIAL COURT
05/22/1990Miscellaneous Motion2D M/L/F EXHIBIT
05/22/1990Exhibits receivedONE COPY OF 'PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND GENUINESS OF DOCUMENTS, RULE 169
01/22/1990Miscellaneous MotionM/L/F TO FILE EXHIBIT
01/22/1990Exhibits receivedONE COPY OF MOTION UNDER RULE #12,
11/02/1989Miscellaneous MotionMOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBSTITUTE EXHIBIT
09/20/1989Miscellaneous MotionMOTION FOR ANCILLARY RELIEF
09/20/1989Exhibits receivedEXPLAINED ON INVENTORY SCREEN
09/20/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
09/20/1989No description available.
09/20/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/20/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GENERAL COUNSEL/STATE BARRespondentMs. Linda Acevedo
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
57th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Joe E. Kelly
83 CI 3482