judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01124-CR
05-89-01124-CR
09/19/1989
Other Drug Possession
Launza, Kenneth Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/12/2020Order enteredDestroy
01/09/2020Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/30/1989Mandate Issued
10/30/1989Mandate Issued
10/27/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
10/27/1989Transcript Filed
10/27/1989Motion to Expedite Mandate
10/27/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
10/27/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
09/26/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/11/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/07/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/12/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable F. H. Entz
F89-84468-VM
3 yrs TDC