judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-89-00224-CR
10-89-00224-CR
09/19/1989
Other Felony
Abel Pablo Barbosa
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/05/2015Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
04/27/2015Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/29/1990Case stored
01/29/1990Mandate issued by this Court
01/18/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
01/18/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the disposition of a process
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/27/2015Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Barbosa, Abel PabloAppellantFernando Villarreal
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasPaul E. Gartner, Jr.
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
Honorable Robert M. Stem
89-544-C
11yrs & $500 fine