judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-89-00198-CR
03-89-00198-CR
09/19/1989
Robbery
Eugene Mitchell
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/23/1993CASE STORED
02/10/1992Mandate Issued
01/10/1992Case returned from higher court
12/11/1991Petition for discretionary review refused
10/01/1991Case forwarded to higher court
09/25/1991Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
09/25/1991Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court
08/28/1991Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
07/24/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/01/1991Submitted
05/01/1991Submission
04/05/1991Submission
11/09/1990Brief filed
11/09/1990Case ready to be set
10/17/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/17/1990Brief filed
10/17/1990Statement of Facts Filed
10/05/1990Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/05/1990Statement of Facts Received
09/05/1990Order Entered
05/23/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/16/1990Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/04/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/28/1990Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/28/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/1990Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/13/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/05/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/20/1989Transcript Filed
09/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/10/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mitchell, EugeneAppellantMr. Walter C. Prentice
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. Philip A. Nelson, Jr.
Trial Court Information
299th District Court
Travis
Honorable Jon N. Wisser
95,634
30 yrs