judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00237-CR
02-89-00237-CR
09/19/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Riley, Jr., Charles Eugene
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/26/1992Mandate Issued
06/09/1992Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/13/1992Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/25/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/08/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCAMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
01/30/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/17/1991Motion Filed
01/17/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
12/19/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/18/1990Letter Brief Filed
10/10/1990Submitted
10/10/1990Submission
10/09/1990Letter Brief Filed
05/23/1990Brief Filed
04/24/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/23/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/30/1990Brief Filed
03/30/1990Submission
02/26/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/23/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/18/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/17/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/17/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/23/1989Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
09/19/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/13/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Riley, Jr., Charles EugeneCriminal - Appellant
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable E. Lee Gabriel
0365902R
Life, TDC