judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00303-CR
07-89-00303-CR
09/19/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Sessions, John Reagon
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/1992Mandate Issued
01/15/1992Case Returned from Higher Court
10/09/1991Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/07/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
08/16/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/27/1990Brief Filed
03/27/1990Case ready to be set
03/02/1990Brief Filed
02/13/1990Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
02/12/1990Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/12/1990Do not use
12/14/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/11/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/20/1989Do not use
09/19/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/31/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
242nd District Court
Hale
Honorable Marvin F. Marshall
8904B10210CR
99 years TDC