judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00224-CR
09-89-00224-CR
09/19/1989
Burglary
LeBlanc, Ronald
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/20/1990Mandate Issued
01/04/1990Miscellaneous MotionsMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1990Order EnteredDismissed
12/21/1989Miscellaneous Motions
12/15/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
11/28/1989Order Entered
11/16/1989Letter
11/06/1989Transcript Filed
09/19/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
36360
3 years Insti Div of TDCJ