judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00223-CR
09-89-00223-CR
09/19/1989
Delivery of a Drug
Jones, Jerry Horton
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/04/1991Mandate Issued
02/25/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
01/30/1991Petition for ReviewRefused
10/24/1990Petition for ReviewFiled in Higher Court
10/19/1990Petition for Review
10/05/1990Motion for Rehearing Received
10/04/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/03/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/26/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/13/1990Submitted
06/13/1990Submission
04/23/1990Supplemental Brief Received
03/23/1990Submission
03/14/1990Brief Filed
03/14/1990Case ready to be set
03/14/1990Miscellaneous MotionsMotion or Writ Denied
03/06/1990Miscellaneous Motions
02/26/1990Brief Filed
12/14/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/11/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/27/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/25/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1989Transcript Filed
10/19/1989Supplemental Brief Received
10/18/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/19/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
51876
25 years - TDC