judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00231-CV
12-89-00231-CV
09/19/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Hightower, Don
Charlton, Louis
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
09/12/1990
09/11/1990Letter from the Court
06/01/1990Mandate Issued
05/16/1990
05/01/1990
04/16/1990Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/1990No Description Available.Dismissed
04/16/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
04/16/1990Submission
04/16/1990Submitted
03/20/1990Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filed
02/08/1990Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
02/05/1990supplemental transcript filed
02/01/1990Order Entered
12/08/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
12/08/1989Order EnteredAbated
11/30/1989
11/30/1989Response to Motion Filed
11/29/1989Brief Filed
11/29/1989Case ready to be set
11/21/1989No Description Available.
11/15/1989
11/15/1989
11/07/1989Brief Filed
10/20/1989supplemental transcript filed
10/10/1989
10/10/1989Exhibit(s) filed
10/10/1989No Description Available.
10/05/1989
10/05/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
09/19/1989motion for extension of time to file bond
09/19/1989Surety Bond Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/13/1989Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
06/15/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hightower, DonAppellant
Charlton, LouisAppellee
Trial Court Information
62nd District Court
Honorable Melvin D. Whitaker
25,630