judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00938-CV
01-89-00938-CV
09/19/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Houston State Associates
Lackshin & Nathan
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/20/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/20/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/22/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
03/22/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
02/09/1990Motion to dismiss appeal
02/01/1990Notice of dismissal
12/28/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
12/28/1989Statement of facts filed
12/20/1989Filing fee paid
12/14/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/05/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/28/1989Filing fee paid
09/19/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/19/1989Transcript filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/17/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantGene F. Creely, II
StateAppelleeNorman Riedmueller
StateAppellantJohn H. Boswell
Trial Court Information
164th District Court
Harris
83-49130-A