Case Information: 00-CF-1112 | |||
Short Caption: | MARCUS D. COLEMAN V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F11248-94 | Filed Date: | 08/15/2000 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/15/2000 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 12/30/2003 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 06/29/2004 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Marcus D. Coleman | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/15/2000 | NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by: Steven D. Kupferberg 301 231-9480 196-444 | |||
09/28/2000 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Allen H. Orenberg, Esquire | |||
10/17/2000 | RECORD ON APPEAL | |||
11/21/2000 | It appearing that the docketing statement was due to be filed with this court on or before October 10, 2000_____________ (See D.C. App. R. 7A (a)(1)), and has not yet been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant(s) shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, file the docketing statement, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the docketing statement out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the docketing statement or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order may result in counsel's appointment being vacated. (pir) | |||
11/27/2000 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS no oppo | |||
11/27/2000 | RECEIVED - aplt's docketing statement (rt ordered) (vvd) | |||
12/06/2000 | On consideration of the motion of appellant for leave to file the lodged docketing statement, and no opposition having been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant is granted, and the lodged docketing statement is filed. (JJ) | |||
12/06/2000 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT (RT ordered) | |||
03/09/2001 | CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED - of Allen H. Orenberg | |||
05/17/2001 | LETTER referring to counsel for appellant the pro se letter from appellant regarding transcript. (JAC) | |||
09/17/2001 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD # 1 (118 pgs--Coney) 5/2/00 proc. | |||
01/10/2002 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD # 2 (42 pgs--Van Bremen) 4/25/00 proc. | |||
04/24/2002 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD # 3 (41 pgs--Bennett) 7/26/00 proc. | |||
12/20/2002 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (4pgs/Tape) 3/20/00 proc. | |||
12/17/2003 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (248 pgs/tape) 5/4/00 proc. | |||
12/30/2003 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
12/31/2003 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (GP) | |||
01/28/2004 | CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED (Orenberg) | |||
02/04/2004 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/21/04 unopposed | |||
02/24/2004 | On consideration of the unopposed motion of appellant for extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and the brief of appellant shall be filed on or before May 21, 2004. (By: GP) | |||
05/18/2004 | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (filed ex parte) | Granted | ||
05/19/2004 | TMC - Aplt's motion to withdraw as counsel | |||
06/02/2004 | ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL and this appeal is hereby dismissed without prejudice for appellant's failure to assist in the prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 14. ( by: SCRARZ) | |||
06/02/2004 | DISMISSED | |||
06/29/2004 | MANDATE ISSUED |